CHELMSFORD YOUNG GENERATION AMATEUR MUSICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of theatrical productions for children aged 8 to 18 years. Summer School Worhsop for Children 8 to 18 based on various stage p[roductions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 14 March 1978: Standard registration
- CYGAMS (Working name)
- YOUNG GEN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLIVE WILTON | Chair | 16 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Burtenshaw | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Anthony Cass | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
ALEX CASS | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALISON KHATTAR | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Christopher Hooper | Trustee | 12 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANET ELIZABETH OSBORNE-WILLIAMS | Trustee | 12 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JAMES KIRWAN | Trustee | 12 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
YVETTE FARIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET STANTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUSSELL DAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.15k | £31.88k | £170.00k | £21.91k | £166.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.94k | £22.77k | £30.00k | £20.50k | £20.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 28 March 2024 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH FEBRUARY 1973
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS, TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS, TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
CHELMSFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Station Road
BRAINTREE
Essex
CM7 3QJ
- Phone:
- 07769276114
- Email:
- JIMMYH@YOUNG-GEN.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window