STAPLEFORD VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village hall meeting place for various groups - eg - Book Club, Village Lottery, Table Tennis, Pool Club, Whist Drive, Plant Sale. The hall is also hired out throughout the year for private meeting space and small events and gatherings The committee organises regular activities and events throughout the year such as Film nights,Talks, Duck Race, Summer BBQ, Harvest Lunch, Christmas Party
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 10 July 1978: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith William Jackson | Chair | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Mary Townsend | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
INGVAR STEPHEN CARTER | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Sophie Louise O'Sullivan | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Jackson | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hector Richard Macdonald | Trustee | 02 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susi Mason | Trustee | 02 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katie Walker | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bob Rhind-Tutt | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.17k | £4.38k | £7.96k | £11.37k | £10.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.48k | £20.02k | £5.63k | £5.88k | £7.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 1ST MARCH 1978 AS AMENDED ON 03 APR 1995
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF STAPLEFORD IN THE COUNTY OF WILTSHIRE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF STAPLEFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stapleford Village Hall
Berwick Road
Stapleford
Salisbury
Wiltshire
SP3 4LJ
- Phone:
- 01722792658
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window