SOMERSET BEEKEEPERS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE CRAFT OF APICULTURE AND TO PROMOTE AND FOSTER THE EDUCATION OF ITS MEMBERS AND OF THE PUBLIC
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Somerset
Governance
- 16 April 1980: Standard registration
- S B K A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Mills | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Vanessa Margaret Woodford | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann Norris | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.41k | £76.54k | £87.30k | £124.03k | £109.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.17k | £66.56k | £76.45k | £115.15k | £112.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 15 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 15 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 21/4/79, AMENDED 15/3/80, 23/8/83, 18/11/89, 20/3/93, 20/3/99 as amended on 01 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CRAFT OF APICULTURE AND TO PROMOTE AND FOSTER THE EDUCATION OF ITS MEMBERS AND OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
SOMERSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
Belgrove
Barton Road
Butleigh
GLASTONBURY
Somerset
BA6 8TL
- Phone:
- 01458850005
- Email:
- peterdhfwb@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window