HAMPSTEAD COMMUNITY ACTION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PLAYGROUPS, PLAYCENTRE (ASC AND PLAYSCHEMES), OVER 60s, SUPPORT GROUPS, PRODUCE MARKET, EDUCATION, ADVICE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £45,330 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Camden
Governance
- 17 March 1981: Standard registration
- HAMPSTEAD COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GUY WINGATE | Chair | 24 November 2014 |
|
|||||||
LINDA CHUNG | Trustee | 09 June 2014 |
|
|||||||
JOHN GOLDSMITH | Trustee | 12 September 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £338.56k | £262.83k | £307.67k | £375.84k | £376.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £335.59k | £247.04k | £276.35k | £332.26k | £356.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £41.40k | £41.55k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £41.43k | £100.11k | £53.09k | £50.00k | £45.33k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 JULY 1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 1 DECEMBER 1980.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS IN THE PART OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CAMDEN BEING THE AREA ENCOMPASSED BY A CIRCLE OF ONE KILOMETRE RADIUS CENTRED ON HAMPSTEAD TUBE STATION.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hampstead Community Centre
78 Hampstead High Street
LONDON
NW3 1RE
- Phone:
- 02077948313
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window