HAYLE DAY CARE CENTRE TRUST COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A day care centre for the elderly providing day care and transport, hot meals, refreshments, personal care (including bathing facilities, hairdressing and podiatry), social interaction, entertainment and advice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £26,352 from 26352 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 17 June 1981: Standard registration
- HAYLE DAY CARE CENTRE TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bernadette MARKS | Chair | 21 June 2013 |
|
|||||||
Tracey Nidds | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dave Cupples | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||
NICK NAVRATIL | Trustee | 18 December 2013 |
|
|||||||
MARY LLOYD | Trustee | 23 November 2011 |
|
|||||||
BRIAN CAPPER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £228.63k | £447.10k | £148.49k | £161.02k | £213.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £211.20k | £153.33k | £101.08k | £169.87k | £200.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £11.02k | £6.46k | £3.94k | £12.45k | £26.35k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £65.39k | N/A | £22.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH JANUARY 1981, AS AMENDED 21ST SEPTEMBER 1983, 24TH FEBRUARY 1988, 27TH JULY 1988 AND 13TH SEPTEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE ELDERLY IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR MAY BE DEEMED CHARITABLE WITHIN THE DISTRICT OF PENWITH SITUATE IN THE COUNTY OF CORNWALL AND ESPECIALLY THE PARISHES OF HAYLE, ST ERTH AND GWINEAR-GWITHIAN AND (B) MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE HAYLE DAY CENTRE FOR THE ELDERLY.
Area of benefit
THE DISTRICT OF PENWITH
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAYLE DAY CARE CENTRE
COMMERCIAL ROAD
HAYLE
TR27 4DE
- Phone:
- 01736755000
- Email:
- admin@hayledaycentre.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window