SOUTHEND-ON-SEA MUSICAL FESTIVAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 283503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

1. To encourage the study, performance and appreciation of good music (and drama) by holding annual public competitions. 2. To afford the competitors the opportunity of having their qualifications tested by eminent adjudicators.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £17,670
Total expenditure: £19,308

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Southend-on-sea

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 August 1982: Standard registration
  • 20 March 2023: Funds received from 284587 SOUTHEND-ON-SEA ARTS COUNCIL
  • 10 May 2023: Funds received from 1032636 LEIGH-ON-SEA MUSICAL FESTIVAL
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SOUTHEND-ON-SEA FESTIVAL OF PERFORMING ARTS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hilary Elizabeth Williams Chair 24 May 2022
None on record
marylisa browne Trustee 14 May 2024
None on record
Melanie Wightman Trustee 14 May 2024
None on record
Cheralyn Eileen Bason Trustee 21 September 2023
None on record
Emma Louise Lindsey Trustee 16 May 2023
THE FREDA PARRY SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
Claire Belinda Golding Trustee 24 May 2022
None on record
Timothy Ian Stuart Browne Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Emma Bearman Trustee 14 May 2019
None on record
ISOBEL MARY KENNEDY Trustee
None on record
LOUISE ANN CASSON MANDERS Trustee
None on record
JENA CHUN-WAH PANG Trustee
THE FREDA PARRY SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £18.38k £2.10k £22.19k £24.57k £17.67k
Total expenditure £18.20k £2.05k £15.33k £19.34k £19.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £490 N/A £500 £490 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 28 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 24 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 11 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 04 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 05 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
20 Woodfield Gardens
LEIGH-ON-SEA
Essex
SS9 1EW
Phone:
07855-184810