EARLEY VOLUNTEER DRIVER BUREAU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Earley Volunteer Driver Bureau provides an individual transport service for elderly or disabled members of the community who are unable to transport themselves or use public transport to get to medical appointments, do their shopping or attend social activities which are important to their quality of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wokingham
Governance
- 28 October 1982: Standard registration
- 29 March 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 29 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1161498 THE WOKINGHAM VOLUNTEER CENTRE
- EARLEY VOLUNTEER CARE BUREAU (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2018 | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.10k | £13.89k | £14.38k | £2.53k | £1.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.69k | £13.80k | £11.87k | £3.13k | £3.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.44k | £5.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.25k | £1.25k | £1.25k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 15 March 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2019 | 17 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JUN 1982 AS AMENDED ON 12 JUN 1996 AS AMENDED ON 04 NOV 2010 AS AMENDED ON 06 JUN 2019
Charitable objects
(A) TO UNDERTAKE VOLUNTARY WORK IN EDUCATION, SOCIAL SERVICES AND SIMILAR CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING TRANSPORT FACILITIES FOR THE ELDERLY AND MOBILITY-RESTRICTED RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (B) TO ADVISE AND GUIDE PERSONS WILLING TO UNDERTAKE VOLUNTARY SERVICE.
Area of benefit
EARLEY AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window