THE MAY CLUB (A GATEWAY CLUB)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE MAY CLUB IS A CLUB FOR THE 16 PLUS PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES, WE HOLD A CLUB NIGHT EVERY MONDAY EVENING, TAKE THEM ON HOLIDAY, OUTINGS, HOLD A DISCO EVERY LAST FRIDAY OF THE MONTH AT THE WELLINGTON CLUB PLUS OTHER ACTIVITIES AS AND WHEN THEY OCCUR
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 21 October 1982: Standard registration
- 07 April 2022: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 07 April 2022: Funds transferred to 1085576 BASINGSTOKE MENCAP SERVICES
- THE MAY CLUB (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.54k | £16.27k | £15.96k | £7.97k | £9.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.90k | £15.67k | £16.49k | £7.30k | £6.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 AUGUST 1982 AS AMENDED 20 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDANTS AND CARERS, AND TO PREVENT LEARNING DISABILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO ADVANCE RELIGION AMONGST PERSONS WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY AND B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OF OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window