SIDNEY SANDERS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty for those who are students of or who are or have been engaged in craft, trade or profession of silversmith, goldsmith or horologist
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 September 1983: Standard registration
- 04 November 2020: Funds received from 275691 G S SANDERS CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Marguerite Elizabeth Warburg | Trustee | 06 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christina Clare Slatter | Trustee | 24 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE BARHAM CARTER MA | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.41k | £96.78k | £29.63k | £27.28k | £31.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.02k | £62.91k | £66.57k | £57.71k | £55.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 03 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST AUGUST 1983
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE PERSONS WHO ARE FOR THE TIME BEING OR HAVE AT ANY TIME PREVIOUSLY BEEN ENGAGED IN THE CRAFT OR TRADE OR PROFESSION OF SILVERSMITH OR GOLDSMITH OR HOROLOGIST AND THE WIVES WIDOWS CHILDREN AND OTHER DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS AS MAY BE AGED IMPOTENT OR POOR AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT IN ANY WAY LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING PROVIDING RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE AND IN PARTICULAR FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Cottage Road
Epsom
KT19 9RT
- Phone:
- 02083934024
- Email:
- JOHNSCUSHNIE@BTINTERNET.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window