PETERSFIELD AND DISTRICT BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a locally based Association interested in the craft of bee-keeping. We train new & improving beekeepers in the wellbeing of bees & the production of quality hive products & promote the importance of bees & the conservation of bee-forage plants to the public. We meet regularly, attend country shows, collect swarms when necessary and aid pollination in our farming community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
- West Sussex
Governance
- 14 December 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bradley William Davis | Chair | 12 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steve Read | Trustee | 15 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Paul Cornelius | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Smyth | Trustee | 10 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jo Bennet | Trustee | 11 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Nicholas Boyd Norman | Trustee | 11 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.99k | £7.44k | £9.16k | £6.77k | £6.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.36k | £6.47k | £9.54k | £3.43k | £2.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 22ND OCTOBER 1983 AS AMENDED ON 11 FEB 2017 as amended on 10 Mar 2018 as amended on 10 Feb 2024 as amended on 15 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE CRAFT OF BEEKEEPING.
Area of benefit
PETERSFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
BayTree House
111 Forest Rod
Whitehill
Hampshire
GU35 9BA
- Phone:
- 07906 124747
- Email:
- msmyth243@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window