THE OXFORD CENTRE FOR MISSION STUDIES

Charity number: 290112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 06 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 06 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 28 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 21 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 21 March 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 02 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 23 March 2016 On time Download