THE OXFORD CENTRE FOR MISSION STUDIES

Charity number: 290112
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Kethoser Kevichusa Trustee 24 September 2020 None on record
Dr Jung-Sook Lee Trustee 24 May 2019 None on record
Dr Grace Dyrness Trustee 06 December 2017 None on record
Dr David Cranston Chair 22 May 2020
GREEN TEMPLETON COLLEGE Charity reporting is up to date
NATHAN ANDREWS Trustee 16 June 2016 None on record
Meritt Sawyer Trustee 23 May 2018 None on record
Dr Ruth Padilla DeBorst Trustee 06 December 2017 None on record
Sarah Ann Hinson Trustee 22 May 2019 None on record