VOLUNTEERING MATTERS

Charity number: 291222
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 February 2019 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 February 2019 18 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 08 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 06 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 06 December 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)