VOLUNTEERING MATTERS

Charity number: 291222
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £2.54m £1.01m £1.57m N/A
Income from government grants £759.00k £0 £343.63k N/A £1.63m
Other income £6.32m £5.19m £4.51m £3.43m £4.31m
Total expenditure £9.00m £7.67m £6.92m £6.26m £5.81m