CHURCHILL PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 296160
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We organise events for parents and pupils in order to raise additional funds to further enhance the teaching and learning experience within our school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £11,168
Total expenditure: £3,450

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • North Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 February 1987: Standard registration
  • 13 June 2024: Funds received from 1181998 CHURCHILL KIDS CLUB
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SALLY FURNISS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £11.19k £5.69k £6.06k £9.39k £11.17k
Total expenditure £15.54k £709 £9.73k £15.55k £3.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 17 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 17 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 20 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Churchill C of E Primary School
Pudding Pie Lane
Langford
Bristol
BS40 5EL
Phone:
01934852446