DANENBERG OBERLIN-IN-LONDON PROGRAM
Charity Number: 297071
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Higher education, first degree level.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2020
Total income: £173,323
Total expenditure: £137,185
Fundraising
This charity does not raise funds from the public
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
Registration history:
- 28 June 1991: Standard registration
- 04 February 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- DANENBERG LONDON PROGRAM (Working name)
- OBERLIN COLLEGE - THE DANENBERG PROGRAM (Working name)
- OBERLIN LONDON PROGRAM (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.16k | £152.59k | £153.29k | £134.91k | £173.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.59k | £145.15k | £147.87k | £148.83k | £137.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 13 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 13 March 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 28 February 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | 28 February 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 DECEMBER 1986
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE STUDY OF BRITISH SOCIETY AND THE HISTORY, PUBLIC AFFAIRS AND CULTURE OF GREAT BRITAIN.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window