THE SERPENTINE TRUST

Charity number: 298809
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE HON MICHAEL R BLOOMBERG Chair 14 January 2014 None on record
Aditya Mittal Trustee 03 October 2019
THE MITTAL FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
Ruth Mackenzie Trustee 08 March 2017
THE ARTS COUNCIL OF ENGLAND Charity reporting is up to date
DAVID ADJAYE Trustee 14 December 2016 None on record
Pierre Philippe Alexandre Lagrange Trustee 14 December 2016 None on record
THE HONORABLE MRS FELICITY WALEY-COHEN Trustee None on record
JONATHAN PAUL WOOD Trustee 26 February 2015
THE CHRISTOPHER GABLE CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
COUNCIL FOR DANCE, DRAMA AND MUSICAL THEATRE Charity reporting is up to date
CENTRAL SCHOOL OF BALLET CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
Nicoletta Fiorucci Trustee 18 December 2019 None on record
Amanda Miriam Sharp Trustee 27 September 2016 None on record
Maja Hoffman Trustee 21 March 2018 None on record
MARCUS JARLATH BOYLE Trustee
BRITISH AMERICAN DRAMA ACADEMY Charity reporting is up to date
Andrew Cohen Trustee 13 December 2017 None on record
Robert Rosenkranz Trustee 18 December 2019 None on record
Lynette Yiadom-Boakye Trustee 11 April 2016 None on record
BARRY TOWNSLEY CBE Trustee 18 January 2012 None on record