F J PERRIN FOR RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Brent
Governance
- 12 January 1967: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 914 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 914 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1279 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1279 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1644 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1644 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST, DATED 30TH JANUARY 1950. DEED OF ASSENT, DATED 14TH JULY 1958.
Charitable objects
A RECREATION GROUND OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH REGULATIONS IN ALL RESPECTS AS THE MAYOR, ALDERMAN AND BURGESSES OF THE BOROUGH OF WEMBLEY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK PROPER.
Area of benefit
WEMBLEY, GREATER LONDON BOROUGH OF BRENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mahatma Gandhi House
34 Wembley Hill Road
Wembley
HA9 8AD
- Phone:
- 02089372341
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window