Financial history BRYANSTON SCHOOL INCORPORATED

Charity number: 306210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £23.84m £23.77m £27.66m £29.44m £31.96m
Total expenditure £23.68m £23.08m £27.96m £29.86m £31.85m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.39m £515.16k £9.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.57m £805.97k £149.20k £705.01k £622.00k
Income - Other trading activities £694.61k £1.12m £1.78m £1.81m £1.97m
Income - Charitable activities £21.49m £21.71m £25.65m £26.74m £29.02m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £84.92k £138.76k £76.56k £185.86k £348.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £482.00k £34.22k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £22.71m £22.09m £26.62m £28.38m £30.27m
Expenditure - Raising funds £20.37k £0 £0 £0 £81.00k
Expenditure - Governance £17.10k £19.77k £18.51k £21.27k £41.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £20.37k £0 £0 £0 £22.00k
Expenditure - Other £940.42k £992.07k £1.33m £1.48m £1.50m