BEXLEY WOMENS AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The mission of Bexley Women's Aid is to enable and empower women and children experiencing domestic violence to obtain and sustain a safe living environment. Services provided include helpline, refuge, floating support, community outreach for women and children and education programs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £87,553 from 2 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bexley
- Kent
Governance
- 14 July 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN STANSFIELD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Uzma Ali | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Lynch | Trustee | 23 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.42k | £156.89k | £108.11k | £183.45k | £247.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £220.27k | £229.11k | £209.31k | £194.11k | £245.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £82.12k | £30.34k | £56.70k | £87.55k | |
|
Income from government grants | £62.86k | N/A | N/A | £38.42k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7TH NOVEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 FEBRUARY 2010
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SEXUAL ABUSE OF WOMEN AND CHILDREN BY THE PROVISION OF REFUGE ACCOMMODATION AND BY SUCH OTHER MEASURES AS SHALL FURTHER THE SAID OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
BEXLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 25
BEXLEYHEATH
KENT
DA7 4BS
- Phone:
- 02083017841
- Email:
- clair@bexleywomensaid.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window