MERCHANT TAYLORS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1063740
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of Schooling

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 March 1963: Standard registration
  • 16 September 2020: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 16 September 2020: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • MERCHANT TAYLORS SCHOOL / ST JOHN'S SCHOOL (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew martin Cree Chair 01 September 2020
None on record
Simon Eggs Trustee 12 June 2024
None on record
Christopher John Williams Trustee 22 November 2023
None on record
Michael Bond Trustee 12 June 2023
None on record
Penelope Barefoot Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Jason Christian Oram Trustee 02 September 2021
None on record
Honourable Richard Hugh Eaton Newall Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Varun Paul Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Lucinda Emily Orr Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
James Douglas Robert Twining Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
GUY BEETHAM MAURICE HENRY DU PARC BRAHAM Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
JANE REDMAN Trustee 15 October 2015
None on record
Sarah Angharad Morgan Trustee 13 November 2013
None on record
DEEPAKKUMAR VELJI VAJABHAI HARIA Trustee 02 May 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £24.04m £26.03m £26.81m £29.18m £31.37m
Total expenditure £22.49m £23.45m £24.90m £26.72m £29.08m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £909.91k £289.32k N/A N/A £26.92k
Income - Donations and legacies £328.29k £1.64m £701.68k £1.31m £975.59k
Income - Other trading activities £56.83k £104.08k £188.98k £156.59k £139.81k
Income - Charitable activities £23.53m £24.22m £25.79m £27.45m £29.80m
Income - Endowments £7.06k £10.50k £0 £252.50k £265.45k
Income - Investment £130.68k £79.11k £129.06k £511.18k £722.89k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £9.36k £122
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.50k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £22.22m £23.22m £24.58m £26.42m £28.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds £271.52k £226.77k £319.53k £303.64k £403.09k
Expenditure - Governance £27.94k £26.58k £28.98k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £14.85k £18.02k £20.71k £18.94k £22.14k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Own use assets £33.33m £33.66m £33.55m £35.86m £39.19m
Long-term investments £6.06m £7.56m £6.73m £6.86m £8.02m
Other assets £5.20m £6.70m £9.66m £10.28m £15.40m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £5.05m £4.67m £5.70m £6.30m £12.63m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 11 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 11 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 06 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 06 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 05 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 05 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 04 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 11 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/05/1955 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 02/06/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02/09/2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE RESTRICTED TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE BY: 4.1 THE PROVISION AND MANAGEMENT OF A SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS FOR CHILDREN FROM THE AGE OF 3 YEARS TO THE AGE OF 18 YEARS; 4.2 THE SUPPORT OF PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT IN THE TEACHING PROFESSION; 4.3 RESEARCH INTO EDUCATIONAL ISSUES AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; 4.4 THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND MENTORING SERVICES TO OTHER SCHOOLS; AND 4.5 THE SUPPORT OF THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN WHO DO NOT ATTEND A SCHOOL PROVIDED OR MANAGED BY THE CHARITY. 4.6 THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, PRIZES AND REWARDS, GRANTS, ALLOWANCES AND BURSARIES TO STUDENTS OR PROSPECTIVE STUDENTS AT: 4.6.1 ANY SCHOOL WHETHER PROVIDED OR MANAGED BY THE CHARITY OR NOT; OR 4.6.2 ANY HIGHER EDUCATION INSTITUTION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 22 March 1963 : Standard registration
  • 16 September 2020 : Removed
  • 16 September 2020 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
Merchant Taylors School
Sandy Lodge Lane
NORTHWOOD
HA6 2HT
Phone:
01923820644