THE ACADEMY OF YOUTH LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide training and support to adults and organisations to enable them to provide high quality learning activities for young people that can take place outside and inside of the school day
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Total income:
£3,046,665
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.04m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £8.41k |
Total expenditure:
£4,925,065
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £4.93m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £3,019,276 from 5 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.93m |
People

84 Employee(s)
1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 15 March 1997: Standard registration
- UNIVERSITY OF THE FIRST AGE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Simms | Chair | 31 August 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.53m | £3.27m | £4.35m | £5.13m | £3.05m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.46m | £3.24m | £4.30m | £5.09m | £4.93m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £3.27m | £3.03m | N/A | £5.02m | £3.02m | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £28.22k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £137.47k | £118.96k | £95.79k | £26.56k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.39m | £3.15m | £4.22m | £5.10m | £3.04m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £6.05k | £1.63k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £8.41k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.46m | £3.24m | £4.03m | £5.05m | £4.93m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £272.03k | £32.59k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £15.25k | £0 | £5.79k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £224.22k | £180.44k | £56.93k | £29.27k | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £462.09k | £764.14k | £1.81m | £1.78m | £795.58k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £249.72k | £477.78k | £1.35m | £1.25m | £2.12m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/02/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/01/1999 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10/12/2010 as amended on 03 Oct 2018 as amended on 03 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
To promote social inclusion for the benefit of the public by the provision of advice, education, employment and housing services for young people and those who are homeless; The advancement of health; and The relief and care of the poor including the homeless and socially excluded persons. For the purpose of this clause: “socially excluded” shall mean excluded from society or parts of society as a result of one or more of the following factors: unemployment, financial hardship, young or old age, ill health (physical or mental); substance abuse or dependency (including alcohol and drugs), discrimination on the grounds of sex, race, disability, ethnic origin, religion, belief, sexual orientation or gender reassignment, poor education or skills attainment, relationship and family breakdown, poor housing (that is housing that does not meet basic habitable standards) or crime (either as a victim of crime or as an offender rehabilitating into society); and “social inclusion” shall mean preventing or reversing social exclusion.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
P 3
Eagle House
Cotmanhay Road
ILKESTON
DE7 8HU
- Phone:
- 01217668077
- Email:
- info@ufa.org.uk
- Website:
-
ufa.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window