BRISTOL TRUST FOR THE DEAF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main objectives of the Trust are: (a) to promote the education of deaf children who are resident in the City of Bristol or the neighbouring District, and (b) to benefit deaf persons by making provision for the education of adults and the technical training of persons over 16 years of age
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bristol City
Governance
- 21 June 1962: Standard registration
- BRISTOL DISTRICT INSTITUTION FOR DEAF AND DUMB (Previous name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Leslie Martin | Chair |
|
||||||||
Lesley Ann Alexander | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|||||||
Councillor Timothy Charles Rippington | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Councillor Joanna Stafford-Townsend | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Councillor Emma Edwards | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
ALDERMAN JACKIE NORMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
COUNCILLOR SUSAN ANN MASON | Trustee |
|
||||||||
ALDERMAN DEREK STEPHEN PICKUP | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.57k | £4.43k | £5.14k | £5.73k | £6.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.26k | £3.69k | £5.18k | £3.03k | £7.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 19.04.1910 AS VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 08.01.1936
Charitable objects
1)PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF DEAF AND DUMB CHILDREN OR DEAF CHILDREN WHO ARE NOT DUMB,WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THE FORMER,WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT 2)THE RESIDUE TO BE APPLIED FOR THE BENEFIT OF DEAF AND DUMB PERSONS OR DEAF PERSONS WHO ARE NOT DUMB,WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THE FORMER,IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS; I) MAKING PROVISION FOR THE INSTRUCTION OF ADULT BENEFICIARIES II) ASSISTING BENEFICIARIES OVER 16 TO CONTINUE THEIR EDUCATION BY LEARNING THE THEORY AND PRACTICE OF SKILLED TRADES,INDUSTRIES AND EMPLOYMENTS BY TECHNICAL INSTRUCTION III) AWARDING EXHIBITIONS TENABLE BY BENEFICIARIES NOT EXCEEDING THE AGE OF 18
Area of benefit
CITY OF BRISTOL AND NEIGHBOURING DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 WELLINGTON WALK
BRISTOL
BS10 5ET
- Phone:
- 01179505631
- Email:
- andyburrows@blueyonder.co.uk
- Website:
-
andyburrowsblueyonder.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window