CAMDEN SCHOOL FOUNDATION OF FRANCES MARY BUSS

Charity number: 312763
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.32m £1.25m £484.52k N/A £189.97k
Other income £220.25k £125.99k £160.67k £429.19k £100.56k
Total expenditure £395.30k £430.67k £373.36k £395.72k £348.13k