SAINT LAWRENCE CHURCH TRUST: WEST WYCOMBE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FUND RAISING FOR CHURCH MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 24 July 1997: Standard registration
- 17 June 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.60k | £13.44k | £2.46k | £3.10k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £100 | £100 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 30 November 2018 | 214 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 27 JANUARY 1997 AS AMENDED 1ST SEPTEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND UNKEEP OF ST LAWRENCE CHURCH WEST WYCOMBE, THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE CHURCH, AND PROTECTION OF THE USE OF THE CHURCH PRIMARILY FOR WORSHIP, BUT ALSO FOR CONCERTS , ARTS EVENTS, AND OTHER APPROPRIATE MEETING.
Area of benefit
BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window