VERSA ORGANISATION LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Counselling service. Complementary therapies. Weight management training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
Governance
- 29 July 1997: Standard registration
- 21 June 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 21 June 2019: Funds transferred to 1176331 AIRE, WHARFE AND CRAVEN COUNSELLING
- KEIGHLEY WOMEN'S CENTRE LTD (Previous name)
- KEIGHLEY WOMENS'S CENTRE LTD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.40k | £2.40k | £22.40k | £62 | £99.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73 | £2.67k | £22.67k | £2.67k | £180.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 11 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 11 September 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 18 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 19 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 JUNE 1997 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28 JUNE 2004 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 01 DECEMBER 2004 AND 16 JUNE 2009.
Charitable objects
1) THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, ADVICE, EDUCATION AND TRAINING 2) THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC CONCERNING HEALTH MATTERS AND THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window