CHRISTIAN SURFERS UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1070830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Christian Surfers UK aims to be a Christian presence and witness in the surfing community. We organise numerous events around the country, ranging from high profile surf competitions to conferences and surf days. In addition we help resource the Christian surf community, and serve the National and local surfing community, by volunteering. We are part of the International Christian Surfers network.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £72,244
Total expenditure: £61,087

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 July 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • CHRISTIAN SURFERS UK (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT CHARLES CROUCH Chair 09 June 2020
HOPE 4 THE WORLD
Received: On time
Benjamin Lillie Trustee 21 January 2023
None on record
Andrew Quinn Trustee 21 January 2023
None on record
Jonathan Ellse Trustee 21 January 2023
None on record
Chelsea Jade Elizabeth Holter Trustee 09 June 2020
None on record
ALICE ELIZABETH LOUISE OVENDEN Trustee 10 February 2014
None on record
ANDREW SWIFT Trustee 07 February 2014
SHARE JESUS
Received: On time
Philip Williams Trustee 28 March 1998
None on record
MR MIKE SCOTT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £62.54k £41.27k £58.03k £72.55k £72.24k
Total expenditure £51.95k £34.62k £41.12k £61.44k £61.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11 WALNUT CLOSE
NAILSEA
BRISTOL
BS48 4YH
Phone:
01275857834