SOBUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sobus is for Voluntary Services in the London Borough of Hammersmith & Fulham. We support a diverse and vibrant voluntary and community sector, providing training, advice, advocacy and support services; as well as supporting individuals, groups and organisations to network and engage with other partners. Sobus is a member of NAVCA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £115,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 18 August 1998: Standard registration
- 12 November 2015: Funds received from 1135138 FULHAM COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP TRUST
- VSRA (Working name)
- COMMUNITY AND VOLUNTARY SECTOR ASSOCIATION HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM (Previous name)
- VOLUNTARY SECTOR RESOURCE AGENCY HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Noushin Pasgar | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Liam Clipsham | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Phillip Amy | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
MONTY GRIGG | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD BRUNWIN | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £471.63k | £370.88k | £424.20k | £376.94k | £447.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £461.48k | £431.74k | £409.93k | £402.79k | £414.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £110.00k | £110.00k | £110.00k | £110.00k | £115.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 April 2021 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 April 2021 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/11/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/08/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/03/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04/12/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/03/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31/03/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01/04/2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM AND SURROUNDING AREA INCLUDING: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY ANY CHARITABLE MEANS, INCLUDING BY THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND RETRAINING OPPORTUNITIES AND TRAINING APPRENTICES; (B) THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH, THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; (C) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, AND IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OR IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING FOR THOSE IN HOUSING NEED; (D) THE DEVELOPMENT OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND THE ENHANCEMENT OF QUALITY OF LIFE; (E) THE PROMOTION OF URBAN REGENERATION; (F) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; (G) THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THOSE WHO BY REASONS OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES. 2.1.2 TO PROMOTE THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR AND ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM AND SURROUNDING AREA AND PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION BETWEEN THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR, STATUTORY BODIES AND OTHER BODIES AS APPROPRIATE TO FURTHER THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY. THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR MEANS: (A) CHARITIES WHICH ARE ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES; AND 2 (B) VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE PUBLIC AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE PUBLIC, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dawes Road Hub
20 Dawes Road
LONDON
SW6 7EN
- Phone:
- 02079521230
- Email:
- sue.spiller@sobus.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window