LYTHAM IN BLOOM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote for the benefit of the public generally and especially those who live in or visit the town of Lytham by providing and encouraging the provision of floral displays, statury, street furniture and the planting of flowering shrubs visible to the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 08 July 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Holding | Chair | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Terry Parkins | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ted Charnley | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Parkins | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Roe | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Horridge | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Ann Fenton | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|||||
John Raymond Thomas | Trustee | 07 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR TIM ASHTON BSC (HONS) | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.36k | £3.64k | £14.85k | £13.53k | £9.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.80k | £4.56k | £8.60k | £14.60k | £14.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.90k | £3.90k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 May 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH DECEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED 26TH MAY 1999, AS AMENDED 6TH APRIL 2004. as amended on 29 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND ESPECIALLY THOSE WHO LIVE IN OR VISIT THE TOWN OF LYTHAM BY PROVIDING AND ENCOURAGING THE PROVISION OF FLORAL DISPLAYS, STATUARY, STREET FURNITURE AND THE PLANTING OF FLOWERING SHRUBS VISIBLE TO THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
TOWN OF LYTHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
95 Pilling Avenue
LYTHAM ST. ANNES
Lancashire
FY8 3QP
- Phone:
- 01253735700
- Email:
- grahamholding@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window