SAVE THE CHILDREN INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1076822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £785.58m £905.51m £945.26m £970.13m £900.33m
Total expenditure £758.80m £926.07m £949.66m £973.97m £903.17m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £71.32m £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £782.96m £904.13m £943.75m £967.85m £897.34m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £86.55k £775.49k £910.72k £1.41m £2.28m
Income - Other £2.53m £602.61k £599.90k £858.98k £713.02k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £753.12m £922.57m £945.33m £969.91m £900.30m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £3.50m £4.33m £4.06m £2.87m
Expenditure - Governance £4.20m £0 £0 £0 £4.50m
Expenditure - Grants institution £161.27m £0 £0 £0 £170.22m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0