Trustees ADJUTANT GENERALS CORPS MUSEUM TRUST
Charity number: 1075877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colonel Victoria Jane Whiting ADC | Chair | 04 June 2021 |
|
|||||
David Boyles | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Maurice John Furlong | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
David John Rutherford | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Lt Col Retd Rowena Naile MBE | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Craig Terblanche | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Mark Michael Theodore Burton-Doe FCMA CGMA | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Wayne Heathcote | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Colonel Bruce Gray | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
COLONEL ALISON KAY BROWN | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|||||
ALFRED JONATHAN WARD | Trustee | 02 December 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.