THE MICHAEL SOBELL HOSPICE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The FoMSH supports Michael Sobell House the hospice and centre for palliative care at Mount Vernon Hospital. The unit embraces a philosophy that is compatible with hospice care and is supported by a multidisciplinary team of doctors, nurses, chaplains, social workers, counsellors, physiotherapists, occupational and complementary therapists, housekeepers and administration staff.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,318,624
Donations and legacies | £880.45k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £409.25k | |
Investments | £15.79k | |
Other | £13.14k |
Total expenditure:
£1,610,409
Raising funds | £536.39k | |
Charitable activities | £1.07m | |
Other | £0 |
£13,500 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £536.39k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.07m |
People

13 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Harrow
- Hertfordshire
- Hillingdon
- Hounslow
- Luton
Governance
- 01 March 2000: Standard registration
- FOMSH (Working name)
- MICHAEL SOBELL HOUSE (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF MICHAEL SOBELL HOUSE (Previous name)
- LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF MICHAEL SOBELL HOUSE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Breen | Chair | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Shreena Raja | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Charles Gloor | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Ashish Devani | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Carmel Mary Gordon-Dark | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL EDWARDS | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.40m | £1.92m | £1.16m | £1.02m | £1.32m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.54m | £1.18m | £1.78m | £1.70m | £1.61m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £75.00k | £30.57k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £697.16k | £1.71m | £747.50k | £595.49k | £880.45k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £638.05k | £153.18k | £386.54k | £387.67k | £409.25k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £25.50k | £13.31k | £15.21k | £19.01k | £15.79k | |
|
Income - Other | £43.44k | £46.49k | £6.62k | £13.19k | £13.14k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £473.40k | £686.11k | £223.09k | £97.69k | £462.41k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.11m | £758.52k | £1.24m | £1.15m | £1.07m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £418.73k | £422.36k | £534.77k | £557.90k | £536.39k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £10.20k | £15.16k | £22.27k | £13.60k | £33.54k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.04m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £9.05k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £12.93k | £17.18k | £10.73k | £19.92k | £13.28k | |
|
Long-term investments | £443.66k | £661.78k | £699.64k | £679.30k | £220.12k | |
|
Other assets | £900.24k | £1.55m | £933.74k | £229.91k | £623.37k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £246.65k | £158.88k | £161.88k | £155.74k | £361.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 DEC 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 JAN 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 OCT 2018 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02 JAN 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 JAN 2019 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23 DEC 2022
Charitable objects
1.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND SUFFERING OF RESIDENTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HILLINGDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS AND THE PROVISION OF ASSOCIATED CARE AND SUPPORT TO THEIR CARERS, DEPENDANTS AND FAMILIES, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: (1) PROVIDING FINANCIAL AND OTHER SUPPORT TO ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING PALLIATIVE AND END OF LIFE CARE; (2) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY ON THE WORK OF SUCH ORGANISATIONS TO RAISE AWARENESS OF PALLIATIVE AND END OF LIFE CARE; AND (3) SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO HIGH QUALITY PALLIATIVE AND END OF LIFE CARE AND DISSEMINATING THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH THROUGH THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
NORTHWOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
MICHAEL SOBELL HOSPICE CHARITY
Mount Vernon Hospital
Rickmansworth Road
NORTHWOOD
HA6 2RN
- Phone:
- 020 3826 2367
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window