BUGLIFE THE INVERTEBRATE CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to conserve invertebrates and their habitats, with current emphasis on surveys to assess the status of species in specific habitat-types, such as brownfields, soft rock cliffs and freshwater. Dissemination of our survey data, public education and the raising of awareness of the need to conserve invertebrates are also key activities. We also work to protect sites of special importance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£2,335,466
Donations and legacies | £241.41k | |
Charitable activities | £2.06m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £31.79k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,091,637
Raising funds | £127.95k | |
Charitable activities | £1.96m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £313,195 from 20 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £127.95k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.96m | |
Retained for future use | £243.83k |
People

33 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Northern Ireland
- Saint Helena
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 May 2002: Standard registration
- 18 November 2022: Funds received from 1126090 THE FRANCIS WILDLIFE CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
- BUGLIFE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Dawkins | Trustee | 29 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nina Seale | Trustee | 29 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Spreadbury | Trustee | 30 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachel Hooper | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard Forster | Trustee | 02 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.36m | £1.57m | £1.37m | £1.57m | £2.34m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.16m | £1.22m | £1.17m | £1.59m | £2.09m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £21.52k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £163.23k | £175.89k | £153.30k | £211.06k | £313.20k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £340.07k | £263.96k | £168.43k | £191.15k | £241.41k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £23.86k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £997.46k | £1.30m | £1.20m | £1.37m | £2.06m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.12k | £4.96k | £3.99k | £4.04k | £31.79k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £104.80k | £168.90k | £4.13k | £0 | £44.01k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.07m | £1.10m | £1.02m | £1.40m | £1.96m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £97.99k | £119.40k | £149.65k | £195.26k | £127.95k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.80k | £15.84k | £16.08k | £22.38k | £21.98k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £714 | £563 | £8.41k | £8.29k | £7.58k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £906.66k | £1.20m | £1.42m | £1.86m | £1.77m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £295.89k | £240.20k | £275.15k | £738.08k | £401.02k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/12/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/02/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/05/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/04/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/05/2013 as amended on 30 May 2015 as amended on 14 Apr 2021 as amended on 25 Jun 2022 as amended on 24 Jun 2023 as amended on 24 Jun 2023 as amended on 24 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
(A) THE STUDY, PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION FROM EXTINCTION OF NATURAL INVERTEBRATE FAUNA BY CONSERVING THEM IN THE WILD BU SUCH MEANS AS ARE AVAILABLE (B) TO PROMOTE AND SPONSOR SCIENTIFIC STUDY AND RESEARCH INTO THE HABITS DISEASES AND LIFE-CYCLES OF SUCH INVERTEBRATE FAUNA AND IN RELATION TO MODERN AGRICULTURAL, HORTICULTURAL, INDUSTRIAL AND HUMAN PRACTICES AND ACTIVITIES, AND TO DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH AS WIDELY AS POSSIBLE (C) TO PROMOTE THE PERMANENT PRESERVATION AND SOUND MANAGEMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY OF LANDS OF ECOLOGICAL OR OTHER SCIENTIFIC IMPORTANCE WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO INVERTEBRATE FAUNA (D) TO FOSTER INTEREST IN GOVERNMENTAL AND VOLUNTARY BODIES, EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS AND THE PUBLIC GENERALLY CONCERNING THE CONSERVATION OR NATURAL INVERTEBRATE FAUNA
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
G.06 The Future Business Centre
London Road
Peterborough
PE2 8AN
- Phone:
- 0300 102 7275
- Email:
- info@buglife.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window