Accounts and annual returns TEDDIES FOR LOVING CARE

Charity number: 1087765
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 26 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 31 July 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 31 July 2020 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 29 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 29 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 26 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 26 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2016 31 July 2017 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 31 July 2017 1 days late Download Open in new window