Financial history TEDDIES FOR LOVING CARE

Charity number: 1087765
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £64.17k £42.53k £26.32k £30.56k £24.42k
Total expenditure £38.73k £48.27k £37.36k £31.13k £16.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A