Governing document THE CONSERVATOIRE FOR DANCE AND DRAMA
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/02/2001 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/11/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24 JAN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 JUL 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CONSERVATOIRE ARE ESTABLISHED ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE PERFORMING ARTS AND THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH IN THE PERFORMING ARTS (PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH ARE PUBLISHED OR OTHERWISE DISSEMINATED) IN SO FAR AS AND NO FURTHER THAN AS MAY BE CHARITABLE. IN THESE ARTICLES, WITHOUT LIMIT TO THE GENERALITY OF THE PHRASE, ”PERFORMING ARTS” SHALL INCLUDE ACTING, DANCE, CIRCUS ARTS AND MUSICAL PERFORMANCE, AND ANY COMBINATION THEREOF AND SHALL INCLUDE ACTIVITIES WHICH ASSIST WITH PERFORMANCES OF ANY OF THE PERFORMING ARTS, USING EITHER LIVE OR RECORDED MEDIA INCLUDING WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING CHOREOGRAPHY, STAGE MANAGEMENT, SET OR COSTUME DESIGN, PRODUCTION AND DIRECTION, AND PROVISION OF EDUCATION OR TRAINING IN ANY SUCH ACTIVITIES. AS A GUIDE TO THE DISCHARGE OF THESE OBJECTS, BUT NOT SO AS TO EXTEND OR RESTRICT THESE OBJECTS, IT IS DECLARED THAT THE CONSERVATOIRE IS ESTABLISHED PRIMARILY FOR THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE TO MEMBERS, AFFILIATES AND/OR ASSOCIATES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.