ST. MARY'S (ENVILLE) TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To the benefit of the Church of St Mary Enville PCC and its members
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 16 July 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER WILLIAMS | Chair | 22 March 2012 |
|
|||||||
Rev Richard Clarkson | Trustee | 17 December 2020 |
|
|||||||
Linda Nora Hingley | Trustee | 17 December 2020 |
|
|||||||
Janet Harris | Trustee | 17 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Patricia Anne Barron | Trustee | 17 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Nigel David Adams | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.57k | £8.35k | £5.47k | £7.55k | £6.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.60k | £10.00k | £0 | £0 | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19TH DECEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
A) THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND, IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PARISHIONERS OF THE CHURCH THE PRESERVATION, RESTORATION AND USE OF THE FABRIC AND CONTENTS OF THE CHURCH; AND B) THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER PURPOSES BEING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
ENVILLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
STOURTON HOUSE
GREENSFORGE LANE
STOURBRIDGE
DY7 5BD
- Phone:
- 01384872245
- Email:
- B.EDWARDS01@BTINTERNET.COM
- Website:
-
n.one
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window