BALLETBOYZ LTD

Charity number: 1088336
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 12 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 April 2019 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 02 April 2019 61 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 16 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 28 July 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)