CANCER RESEARCH UK

Charity number: 1089464
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £3.23m £576.81k £239.11k £148.77k £756.36k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £631.58m £634.57m £679.04m £634.21m £671.14m
Total expenditure £602.10m £629.84m £665.59m £652.23m £783.27m