HOME-START LICHFIELD AND DISTRICT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PRACTICAL & EMOTIONAL SUPPORT TO FAMILIES WITH AT LEAST ONE CHILD UNDER 5 GOING THROUGH DIFFICULT TIMES. SUPPORT IS OFFERED IN THE FAMILY HOME.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 29 April 2002: Standard registration
- 15 June 2017: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 15 June 2017: Funds transferred to 1160537 HOME-START LICHFIELD AND DISTRICT LIMITED BY GUARA...
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.69k | £85.44k | £85.44k | £82.94k | £80.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.82k | £80.62k | £80.62k | £82.56k | £70.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 27 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2014
(These accounts |
20 January 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 NOVEMBER 2001.
Charitable objects
1) TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS CHILDREN 2) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN 3) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN. 4) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE WITHIN THE AREA OF LICHFIELD AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window