BRIDGEND COUNTY CROSSROADS, CARING FOR CARERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our scheme provides care services for service users who are aged 18 +, in their own homes or taking them for outings. We work across the Bridgend County Borough. Our cared for are mainly elderly with various health conditions. We also run 2 community cafes, that are open to all to provide advice, support & activities. On Saturdays we run a social club for people with dementia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £21,371 from 2 government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bridgend
Governance
- 12 February 2002: Standard registration
- 27 July 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 27 July 2023: Funds transferred to 1123455 The Care Collective De Cymru Limited
- CROSSROADS CARE BRIDGEND COUNTY (Working name)
- PORTHCAWL AND DISTRICT CROSSROADS CARING FOR CARERS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £557.07k | £775.04k | £355.64k | £382.43k | £21.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £533.61k | £787.63k | £344.94k | £405.93k | £21.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £165.80k | £610.94k | £282.73k | £321.35k | £21.37k | |
|
Income from government grants | £277.15k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £556.99k | £1.98k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £2.71k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £159.28k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £76 | £124 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £508.56k | £787.63k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £22.08k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.97k | £4.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £2.97k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 April 2021 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 April 2021 | 71 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 JUNE 2001, AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01 NOVEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE STRESSES EXPERIENCED BY CARERS, AND CHILDREN AND ADULTS WHO HAVE CARE NEEDS, AS A RESULT OF DISABILITY, ILLNESS OR AGE BY OFFERING A RESPITE SERVICE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY-BASED SUPPORT WORKERS. THE AREA OF BENEFIT SHALL BE AS AGREED BY THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF CROSSROAD ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE. BRIDGEND.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window