SEASHELL TRUST

Charity number: 1092655
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity provides high quality specialist care and education, including physical training, to children and young adults with one or more form of complex communication and learning difficulties which means that they require special provision. Royal Schools for the Deaf, Manchester (charity no 526091) gifted certain assets and its operating activities to Seashell Trust on 1 September 2008.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Stockport

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 September 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • SEA SHELL TRUST (Previous name)
  • SEA SHELL TRUSTEE LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Lloyd Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
Elanor Kortland Trustee 11 February 2025
None on record
Beth Holbrook Trustee 08 July 2024
None on record
Joanna Munnelly Trustee 10 October 2022
None on record
Colin Hoggins Trustee 07 February 2022
None on record
Rachel McMillan Trustee 07 February 2022
None on record
Dr Lynn Perry Trustee 19 July 2021
None on record
Neil Andrew Masom Trustee 01 February 2021
None on record
Carol Povey Trustee 15 July 2019
None on record
Martin Heath Trustee 15 July 2019
None on record
CHRISTOPHER LUKE SMALE Trustee 30 January 2017
LIVERPOOL RENAISSANCE SINGERS
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARTHOLOMEW, THURSTASTON
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £16.09m £19.11m £37.41m £20.28m £27.42m
Total expenditure £17.22m £17.06m £18.01m £19.43m £23.11m
Income from government contracts N/A £13.70m £15.90m £16.98m £19.21m
Income from government grants £1.20m £150.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £822.00k £429.00k £5.34m £2.10m £7.10m
Income - Other trading activities £385.00k £154.00k £191.00k £414.00k £65.00k
Income - Charitable activities £14.85m £15.43m £16.76m £17.77m £20.19m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £3.06m
Income - Investment £26.00k £10.00k £2.00k £5.00k £66.00k
Income - Other £0 £3.09m £15.11m £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £16.66m £16.58m £17.44m £18.90m £22.53m
Expenditure - Raising funds £466.00k £412.00k £462.00k £467.00k £576.00k
Expenditure - Governance £98.00k £71.00k £104.00k £61.00k £94.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £4.00k £2.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £98.00k £70.00k £104.00k £61.00k £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £14.92m £14.14m £17.27m £33.07m £38.65m
Long-term investments £987.00k £249.00k £0 £0 £0
Other assets £4.78m £7.83m £24.53m £10.45m £8.30m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £2.94m £2.44m £2.62m £3.49m £2.61m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 10 July 2024 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 10 July 2024 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 28 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CHARITY COMMISSION SCHEME DATED 28 AUGUST 2008 AS AMENDED ON 06 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION (INCLUDUNG SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) AND/OR WELFARE OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS WHO, THROUGH ANY ONE OR MORE FORMS OF DISABILITY, REQUIRE SPECIAL PROVISION FOR THEIR NEEDS ("BENEFICIARIES"), AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THOSE OBJECTS TO PROVIDE SUITABLE FACILITIES FOR ASSESSMENT, NURSERY CARE, EDUCATION, TRAINING, WORK EXPERIENCE, RECREATION, CARE, RESIDIENTIAL ACCOMMODATION AND SUPPORT FOR BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 01 September 2008 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Seashell Trust
Stanley Road
Cheadle Hulme
Cheadle
SK8 6RQ
Phone:
01616100100