HAMBLETON AND RICHMONDSHIRE CARERS CENTRE

Charity number: 1092023
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We offer support, advice and information to unpaid carers of all ages including young carers. We provide benefit advice, emotional support, social groups, activities and signposting. Working in partnership with carers we raise awareness of carer issues, contribute to local, regional and national debate and strategy for carers and collaborate with local agencies to strengthen the voice of carers.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2021

Total income: £272,006
Total expenditure: £334,432

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 May 2002: Standard registration
  • 24 August 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 24 August 2022: Funds transferred to 1046228 Carers Plus Yorkshire Ltd
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £240.10k £281.87k £289.03k £271.25k £272.01k
Total expenditure £292.10k £307.50k £294.34k £276.15k £334.43k
Income from government contracts £189.01k £182.45k £187.36k £189.29k £242.20k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2021 06 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 06 January 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 January 2020 On Time