THE ALNWICK GARDEN TRUST

Charity number: 1095435
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £3.77k £10.63k £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £4.38m £4.65m £4.70m £5.10m £5.18m
Total expenditure £5.43m £5.48m £5.69m £6.21m £6.25m