THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH BARNARD CASTLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim is to help maintain and preserve the fabric of St. Mary's Parish Church, Barnard Castle and its' Parish Hall. This is done by organising social events and visits open to the general public as well as members on a regular basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Durham
Governance
- 29 May 2003: Standard registration
- FOSMS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr John Jackson White | Trustee | 19 March 2021 |
|
|||||||
Pam Westgarth | Trustee | 23 January 2017 |
|
|||||||
PAULINE LOUGHRAN-HANBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JENNIFER MARGARET WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
CAROLYN LOUISE ROBSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Rev ALEC JAMES HARDING | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Dr PATRICIA ANN CHILD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.37k | £6.78k | £7.89k | £4.80k | £1.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.10k | £3.57k | £12.09k | £5.12k | £1.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN, REPAIR, RESTORE, PRESERVE, IMPROVE, BEAUTIFY AND RECONSTRUCT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE FABRIC OF ST MARY'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND CHURCH BARNARD CASTLE IN THE DIOCESE OF DURHAM, TOGETHER WITH ITS MONUMENTS, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, FURNITURE, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS AND OTHER CHATTELS; ALSO ITS PARISH HALL AND ITS CHURCHYARD.
Area of benefit
BARNARD CASTLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
MARDEN HOUSE
DARLINGTON ROAD
BARNARD CASTLE
DL12 8TA
- Phone:
- 01833637714
- Email:
- dipeat@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window