ST LUKE'S PRE SCHOOL NURSERY LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide day care for children aged 1 to 11 from the local community including breakfast club, nursery, afterschool care and holiday clubs. Transport to and from the local primary school is provided by mini-bus.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Total income includes £45,521 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 02 September 2003: Standard registration
- 05 July 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 05 July 2024: Funds transferred to 1136795 ST LUKES CHURCH, LODGE MOOR
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £139.40k | £134.77k | £143.00k | £140.51k | £82.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.02k | £138.90k | £137.78k | £134.01k | £114.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £68.96k | £45.52k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/07/2003 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29/07/2014
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE SPIRITUAL DEVELOPMENT) OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE AND (OUTSIDE SCHOOL HOURS) OF CHILDREN OF PRIMARY SCHOOL AGE AND THE PROVISION OF RECREATION FOR SUCH CHILDREN IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE BY PROVIDING FOR CHILDREN OF ALL FAITHS AND NONE, WITHOUT DISCRIMINATION, A SAFE AND SATISFYING PRE-SCHOOL AND OUT OF SCHOOL EXPERIENCE WITH A CHRISTIAN ENVIRONMENT WHERE CHRISTIAN BELIEFS AND VALUES ARE PROMOTED AND UPHELD. THIS WILL BE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE MISSION OF ST LUKE’S CHURCH, LODGE MOOR WHICH SEEKS TO PROVIDE SERVICES TO THE COMMUNITY AND TO PROMOTE CHRISTIANITY WITHIN IT. INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE LODGE MOOR
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window