FINSBURY PARK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Finsbury Park Trust supports vulnerable people and responds to community need in order to improve the lives of all people in Finsbury Park. We support local people to take action to improve their lives for the better and respond to community need. The charity was established to play a pivotal role in regenerating the Finsbury Park neighbourhood, which lies on the corner of three boroughs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
Governance
- 26 August 2004: Standard registration
- FINFUTURE (Previous name)
- FINSBURY PARK TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephanie Ann Downes | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marian Spall | Trustee | 07 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Soraya Adejare | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Isobel Worrell | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Christine Hemmings | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Polly Isobel Robbins | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthonia Onigbode | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Lawrence Singha | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £230.82k | £145.42k | £86.78k | £208.22k | £141.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £309.94k | £166.74k | £165.46k | £203.00k | £162.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.60k | N/A | £111.10k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 March 2021 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 March 2021 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/07/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/12/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/06/2013
Charitable objects
3.1 THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION AND IN PARTICULAR IN FINSBURY PARK AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS. (A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; (B) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; (D) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OF CONSULTING IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE THROUGH HELP:- (I) TO ENABLE PEOPLE TO SET UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR (II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES (E) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDING, AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; (F) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING; (G) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; (H) THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; (I) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; (J) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE; (K) THE PROTECTION AND CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; (L) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME; (M) THE PROVISION OF OFFICE AND MEETING SPACE FOR NON-PROFIT MAKING ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS AND N) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION FOR ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION IN PARTICULAR IN FINSBURY PARK AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Finsbury Park Trust
225-229 Seven Sisters Road
LONDON
N4 2DA
- Phone:
- 07714237408
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window