RAYS OF SUNSHINE

Charity number: 1102529
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £4.18m £4.42m £4.03m £4.78m £5.09m
Total expenditure £3.78m £4.63m £3.66m £4.32m £4.49m