THE CHILDREN'S WORKSHOP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Children's Workshop is a pre-school for local children aged between 2 and five years old. The Children's Workshop is open for 38 weeks a year and children may attend a maximum of 7 sessions a week. The Children's Workshop is registered and inspected by Ofsted.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Inese Brand | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jillian Battersby | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Warner | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Scrace | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Cheeseman | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Katie Garman | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jocelyn Walbridge | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Burgess | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Kristina Brockington | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Mackert | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kinvara Rogers | Trustee | 29 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £197.49k | £169.65k | £158.72k | £180.20k | £218.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £172.40k | £157.54k | £164.01k | £184.13k | £210.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £88.85k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.75k | N/A | N/A | £540 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 FEBRUARY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 JUL 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 SEP 2016 as amended on 06 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE SEVENOAKS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Childrens Workshop
Environmental Park
Buckhurst Lane
SEVENOAKS
TN13 1FE
- Phone:
- 01732741391
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window