THE ST MARY'S BARNARD CASTLE PARISH HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a hall for the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Durham
Governance
- 30 April 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLARE TREVETT | Chair |
|
||||||||
Francis Alfred John Blissett | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Vivian Guy | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Louise Scott | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|||||||
John Wilson Trevett | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Alan Munro Beaty | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Rev ALEC JAMES HARDING | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.64k | £8.71k | £11.17k | £14.95k | £23.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.91k | £14.08k | £10.14k | £9.46k | £21.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £4.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.04k | N/A | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 FEBRUARY 2004, AS AMENDED DATED 27THMARCH 2006.
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL UNITED PARISH OF ST MARY'S BARNARD CASTLE WITH WHORLTON IN THE DEANERY OF BARNARD CASTLE IN THE DIOCESE OF DURHAM AND THOSE PARISHES IMMEDIATELY ADJACENT TO IT (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS IN PARTICULAR BY ASSOCIATING THE DIOCESAN AUTHORITIES, LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY BUILDING (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE PARISH HALL") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, OR TO CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL OR STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A HALL FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. (C) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED. (D) THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
THE ECCLESIASTICAL UNITED PARISH OF ST MARY'S BARNARD CASTLE WITH WHORLTON AND THOSE PARISHES IMMEDIATELY ADJACENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VICARAGE
PARSONS LONNEN
BARNARD CASTLE
COUNTY DURHAM
DL12 8ST
- Phone:
- 01833637018
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window